CA AB2145 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 672, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 39719.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicular air pollution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2145 REYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2145 Reyes By Lara (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2145 REYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 672, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5898.).
2018-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5436.)
2018-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
2018-05-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code39719.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44272Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback