CA AB2145 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44125 and 44258.4 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Vehicle replacement: rebates.
Sponsors
Asm. Eric Linder [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44258.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |