CA AB2143 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 128454 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health: Licensed Mental Health Service Provider Education Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2143 CABALLERO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2143 Caballero et al. By Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2143 CABALLERO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2143 Caballero et al. By Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2143 CABALLERO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6497.). |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5444.). |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5305.). |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2815.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3521.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4989.69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 128454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 128456 | New Code | See Bill Text |