CA AB2141 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 748 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy assistance: corner stores.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom committee without further action.
2016-05-27AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2016-05-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2016-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 13).
2016-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & C.
2016-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
2016-03-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2016-02-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & C.
2016-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2016-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code748New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback