CA AB2140 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - From committee: That the measure be retained in committee, and that the subject matter be referred to the Committee on Rules for assignment to the proper committee for study. (April 8). By unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 4502 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to marine mammals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marine mammals: protection of orcas: unlawful activities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: That the measure be retained in committee, and that the subject matter be referred to the Committee on Rules for assignment to the proper committee for study. (April 8). By unanimous consent.
2014-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
2014-03-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
2014-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2014-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code4502New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code701.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback