CA AB2135 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 13996.45 to the Government Code, relating to economic development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GO-BIZ: trade and investment office: Japan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2020-04-06AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-02-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2020-02-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2020-02-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13996.45New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback