CA AB2134 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 14 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 7349 and 7395.1 of, and to add Section 7395.2 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to barbering and cosmetology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cosmetology students: externships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2134 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2134 RUBIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5214.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7349Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7395.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7395.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback