CA AB2133 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 22.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 22.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38566 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gas emissions.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: emissions limit.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] |
Sen. John Laird [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2133 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2133 Quirk et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2133 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2133 Quirk et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2133 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 22.) |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 10. Page 5418.). |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 10. Page 5418.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Measure version as amended on August 23 corrected. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 29). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.) |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-02 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 14. Page 4705.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11). |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38566 | Amended Code | Citation Text |