CA AB2133 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1596.86 of, and to add Section 1596.864 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to child care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child care: provider training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-02 - AB 2133 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-22SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2016-06-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2016-06-20SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2016-06-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2016-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2016-06-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5184.)
2016-06-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-31AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2016-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 27).
2016-05-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2016-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2016-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2016-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2016-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2016-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2016-03-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2016-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2016-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code8221.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8221.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code89000Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1596.86Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1596.864New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2133&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2133_bill_20160217_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2133_bill_20160318_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2133_bill_20160405_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2133_bill_20160412_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2133_bill_20160531_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2133_bill_20160616_amended_sen_v94.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2133_vote_20160420_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2133_vote_20160527_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2133_vote_20160602_1210PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback