CA AB2124 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1513 of the Probate Code, and to amend Sections 331, 360, 366.4, and 11363 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to guardianship.
Title
Guardianships.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2020-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 1513 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11363 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 331 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2124 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2124 |