CA AB2122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26038 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful cannabis activity: enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2122 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-02-20AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
2020-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
2020-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26038Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback