CA AB212 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Victim Compensation Board: claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB212 Gonzalez Fletcher By Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 212 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Third Reading Urgency (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-18 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2017-06-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-06-29SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1804.).
2017-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1131.).
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
2017-03-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-02-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on APPR.
2017-01-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
2017-01-23AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback