CA AB212 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25402 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: building standards: zero net energy buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Lori Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-04-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13). | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-02-03 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |