CA AB2114 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19020 and 21281.5 of, and to add Section 21070 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to livestock inspection, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Livestock inspection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Assembly - AB 2114 BIGELOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2114 Bigelow et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2114 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5214.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-19AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2018-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code19020Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code21070New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code21281.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback