CA AB2110 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14105.198 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public health.
Title
Medi-Cal: Adverse Childhood Experiences trauma screenings: providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.198 | New Code | See Bill Text |