CA AB2108 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 189.7 and 13149.2 to the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water policy: environmental justice: disadvantaged and tribal communities.
Sponsors
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Asm. Steve Bennett [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Asm. James Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2108 Robert Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2108 Robert Rivas et al. By Limón (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2108 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2108 Robert Rivas et al. By Limón (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2108 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 18.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5223.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 15). |
2022-06-10 | Senate | 6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 4976.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 13149.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 189.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |