CA AB2107 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 956, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 956, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1210 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to clinical laboratories, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Clinical laboratory testing.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2107 FLORA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2107 Flora By Newman Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2107 Flora Third Reading Urgency (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2107 Flora By Newman Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2107 Flora Third Reading Urgency (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 956, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5379.). |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | From special consent calendar. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5023.). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4737.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on April 6 corrected. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |