CA AB2106 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1007, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1203.044 to the Penal Code, relating to probation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2106 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2106 McCarty By Wahab (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2106 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1007, Statutes of 2024.
2024-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2024-09-11 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2024-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.).
2024-08-28AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2024-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2024-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2024-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-15SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2024-08-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2024-08-05SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2024-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-07-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2024-06-05SenateReferred to Com. on PUB S.
2024-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2024-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 0. Page 5599.)
2024-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2024-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2024-05-16AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2024-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2024-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-04-23AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2024-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16).
2024-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2024-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
2024-02-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1203.044New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB2106
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB2106#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB2106#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB2106#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB2106#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB2106#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB2106#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB2106#93ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB2106#92CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB2106

Bill Comments

feedback