CA AB2105 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3345.1 to the Civil Code, relating to punitive damages.
Title
Punitive damages: minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 2105 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2105 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - AB 2105 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2105 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - AB 2105 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6136.). |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5037.). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4531.) |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3345.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |