CA AB2102 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Glazer.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1797.119 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State of emergency: out-of-state aid: reciprocity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2102 RODRIGUEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Glazer.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-11SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5214.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2018-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8619.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1797.119New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback