CA AB2101 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 39740.1 and 39740.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to carbon sequestration.
Title
California Carbon Sequestration and Climate Resiliency Project Registry: whole orchard recycling projects.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2101 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2101 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2101 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4574.). |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-06-10 | Senate | 6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4739.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39740.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39740.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |