CA AB2101 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 275, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 275, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22106.2, 22119.5, 22144.3, 22156.1, 22170.5, 22501, 22509, 22711, 22714, 22717, 22718, 24204, 25025, 26113, 26801, 26803, 26804, 26808, 26810, and 27204 of, to add Sections 23011 and 26303.7 to, and to repeal Section 22151 of, the Education Code, and to amend Sections 20230, 20731, 22772, 22960.95, 22970.85, 31465, 31627.1, 31627.2, 31631.5, 31641.45, 31646, 31662.2, 31670, 31672, 31672.1, 31672.2, 31672.3, 31706, 31760.1, 31760.2, 31765, 31765.1, 31776.3, 31781.1, 31781.2, 31785, 31785.1, 31786, 31786.1, 31787, 31787.5, 31855.3, and 75088.3 of, to add Sections 31454.7 and 31680.10 to, to repeal Sections 31649.5, 31649.6, 31650, and 31651 of, and to repeal and add Section 31649 of, the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public employees’ retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2101 Public Employment and Re Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB2101 P.E. & R (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2101 P.E. & R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB2101 P.E. & R (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2101 P.E. & R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 275, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5376.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5274.) |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4382.). |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4725.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2020-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |