CA AB2100 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 13956, 13957.7, and 13957.9 of the Government Code, relating to victim’s restitution, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Victim Compensation Board: victim restitution: violence peer counseling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-02-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2018-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13956Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13957.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13957.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback