CA AB2097 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 42975 and 42976 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carpet recycling: annual reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2097 Acosta By Stone (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2097 ACOSTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5802.).
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 4825.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-02-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2018-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code42975Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42976Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback