CA AB2094 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 26039 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: facilities used for unlawful purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26039 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2094 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2094 |