CA AB2093 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 9014 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petitions: filings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2093 Grove (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2093 GROVE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2014.
2014-07-09 Approved by the Governor.
2014-07-02AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m.
2014-06-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2014-06-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4142.).
2014-06-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 17).
2014-05-28SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2014-05-19SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5006.)
2014-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2014-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2014-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2014-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2014-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code9014Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9030Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2093&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2051-2100/ab_2093_bill_20140220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2051-2100/ab_2093_bill_20140328_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2051-2100/ab_2093_bill_20140513_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2051-2100/ab_2093_bill_20140630_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2051-2100/ab_2093_bill_20140709_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2051-2100/ab_2093_vote_20140506_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2051-2100/ab_2093_vote_20140519_1253PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2051-2100/ab_2093_vote_20140617_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2051-2100/ab_2093_vote_20140626_0949AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback