CA AB2093 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9014 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Petitions: filings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2093 Grove (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2093 GROVE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2093 GROVE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4142.). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5006.) |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |