CA AB2091 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 56.108 to the Civil Code, to amend Sections 2029.200, 2029.300, and 2029.350 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 123466 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 791.29 of the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 3408 of the Penal Code, relating to information disclosure, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Disclosure of information: reproductive health and foreign penal civil actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2091 BONTA, M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2091 Mia Bonta et al. By Gonzalez Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2091 Mia Bonta Third Reading Urgency (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2091 BONTA, M. Assembly Third Reading Amend By BONTA, M. Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2091 Mia Bonta et al. By Gonzalez Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2091 Mia Bonta Third Reading Urgency (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2091 BONTA, M. Assembly Third Reading Amend By BONTA, M. Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 15.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5386.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.). |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 50. Noes 14. Page 4651.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11). |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 5). |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 2029.200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 2029.300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 2029.350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 56.108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 123466 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 791.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3408 | Amended Code | Citation Text |