CA AB2089 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 690, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 690, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56.05 and 56.06 of, and to add Chapter 4.1 (commencing with Section 56.251) to Part 2.6 of Division 1 of, the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Privacy: mental health digital services: mental health application information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2089 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2089 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Eggman (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2089 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2089 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Eggman (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2089 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 690, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4879.). |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 56.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 56.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 56.251 | New Code | See Bill Text |