CA AB2087 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 1850) to Division 2 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Regional conservation investment strategies.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2087 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2087 Levine By Allen (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2087 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2087 Levine By Allen (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2087 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6580.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 6581.). |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5565.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5585.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5591.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Measure version as amended on August 16 corrected. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28). |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 5249.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 27). |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1850 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2090 | New Code | See Bill Text |