CA AB2085 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25503.9 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Tied-house restrictions: donations of alcoholic beverages: returns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25503.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2085 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2085 |