CA AB2078 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the heading of Article 8 (commencing with Section 347) of Chapter 2.5 of Division 1 of, and to repeal and add Section 347 of, the Water Code, relating to atmospheric rivers.
Title
Atmospheric Rivers: Research, Mitigation, and Climate Forecasting Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 347 | New Code | See Bill Text |