CA AB2077 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 4430.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 4430.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4145.5 of, and to repeal Sections 4142 and 4326 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 11364 of, and to repeal Section 121285 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Hypodermic needles and syringes.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2077 Ting By Pan (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2077 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2077 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 4430.). | |
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 274, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10.). |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 4691.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 2). |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 18). |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4142 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4145.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4326 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11364 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 121285 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |