CA AB2077 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2830.5 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity: local government renewable energy self-generation program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-02-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
2018-02-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code2827Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2830Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2830.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback