CA AB2070 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-06 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-06 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 67386 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: sexual assault and sexual violence prevention training: intimate partner and dating violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2070 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2070 REYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2070 REYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-06 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-07-18 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-07-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5038.). |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5130.) |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 67386 | Amended Code | Citation Text |