CA AB207 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1633 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance licensing.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Assembly - Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 207 Daly Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 207 Daly Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1473.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1633 | Amended Code | Citation Text |