CA AB2069 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12940 of the Government Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Medicinal cannabis: employment discrimination.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |