CA AB2067 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 792.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: balancing accounts: reviews and audits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 792.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2067 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2067 |