CA AB2066 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 17052 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: credit: earned income: eligible individual.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-15AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 7).
2018-03-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
2018-02-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17052Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback