CA AB206 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 18.5 (commencing with Section 69975) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: California DREAM Work-Study
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] |
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 7). |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69975 | New Code | See Bill Text |