CA AB2058 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 23152 and 23153 of the Vehicle Code, relating to driving under the influence.
Title
Vehicles: driving under the influence: cannabis.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2058 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2058 Chau By Hill (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2058 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2058 Chau By Hill (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2058 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6644.). |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5662.). |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 4. Page 5603.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 1821 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23155 | New Code | See Bill Text |