CA AB2055 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 14124.245 and 14724 to, and to add Article 3.3 (commencing with Section 14124.3) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Specialty mental health services and substance use disorder treatment.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14124.245 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14724 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2055 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2055 |