CA AB2054 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5010.1 of the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State parks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2054 Gonzalez Fletcher Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2054 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2054 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-29 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 31).
2018-08-31AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2018-08-31AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-31SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6077.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-22SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2018-08-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-07-02SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5402.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-19AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-03-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2018-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code6050New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5010.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5010.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback