CA AB2053 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1212 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to clinics.
Title
Primary care clinics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2053 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2053 Gonzalez By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2053 GONZALEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2053 Gonzalez By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2053 GONZALEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6433.). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5269.). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 1). |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4463.) |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |