CA AB2051 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 13307 of the Elections Code, and to amend Section 85601 of the Government Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Candidate’s statement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
2018-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-02-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2018-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code13307Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code85601Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback