CA AB2049 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 45168 and 88167 of the Education Code, relating to school and community college employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Classified school and community college employees: payroll deductions for employee organization dues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2049 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 5401.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and HIGHER ED.
2018-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2018-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code45109Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code45168Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88167Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback