CA AB2044 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 78042 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: community colleges: statewide baccalaureate degree program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2044 Chen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2044 Chen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4997.) |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78042 | Amended Code | Citation Text |