CA AB2044 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 941, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 941, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3011, 3020, 3044, and 3100 of the Family Code, and to amend Section 68555 of the Government Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic violence: family court.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2044 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2044 Mark Stone et al. By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2044 Mark Stone et al. By Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - AB 2044 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2044 Mark Stone et al. By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2044 Mark Stone et al. By Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - AB 2044 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 941, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6608.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5552.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5035.). |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 4530.) |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 3). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 3011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3044 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |