CA AB2035 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 62250, 62251, 62252, 62253, 62254, and 62255 of, and to add Section 62261.1 to, the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affordable housing authorities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2035 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2035 Mullin et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2035 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 3).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 5513.)
2018-05-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 9).
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-04-16AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 11).
2018-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
2018-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2018-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback