CA AB2035 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4214 of the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
State responsibility areas: payments to local government entities: fire prevention activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |